LA HB888 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Social Work Licensure Compact (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Social Work Licensure Compact (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 888 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1522) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 888 FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 888 FINAL PASSAGE (#693) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 888 FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 888 FINAL PASSAGE (#693) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 3. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |