LA HB869 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires continuing education for the treatment of sickle cell disease for physicians and physician assistants
Title
Requires continuing education for the treatment of sickle cell disease for physicians and physician assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 869 FINAL PASSAGE (#819) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 869 FINAL PASSAGE (#689) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 869 FINAL PASSAGE (#689) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-24 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |