LA HB853 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office of surgeon general within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office of surgeon general within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 853 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1554) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 853 FINAL PASSAGE (#1119) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 853 FINAL PASSAGE (#509) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 853 FINAL PASSAGE (#1119) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 853 FINAL PASSAGE (#509) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |