LA HB8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the release of information associated with concealed handgun permits or applications for such permits (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Prohibits the release of information associated with concealed handgun permits or applications for such permits (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 ADOPT (#1020) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 8 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#917) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 8 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#595) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#490) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 AMENDMENT # 2136 BY CLAITOR HB 8 BY THOMPSON (#489) (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 8 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#917) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 8 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#595) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#490) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 AMENDMENT # 2136 BY CLAITOR HB 8 BY THOMPSON (#489) (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 401. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Kostelka, and Murray. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | House conferees appointed: Thompson, Lopinto, and Terry Landry. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-5) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-02-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/8/2013. |
2013-02-05 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-02-05 | House | Prefiled. |