LA HB628 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Effective date: June 11, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Effective date: June 11, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for technical corrections to various provisions of the La. Revised Statutes, the Children's Code, and the Code of Criminal Procedure
Title
Provides for technical corrections to various provisions of the La. Revised Statutes, the Children's Code, and the Code of Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 628 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#736) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 628 FINAL PASSAGE (#633) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 628, FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 628 FINAL PASSAGE (#633) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 628, FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | House | Effective date: June 11, 2013. |
2013-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 220. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013. |
2013-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |