LA HB618 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to accident reporting and access to medical records and information related to claims
Title
Provides relative to accident reporting and access to medical records and information related to claims
Sponsors
Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Jack McFarland [R] |
Rep. Michael Melerine [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2024-04-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (10-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |