LA HB569 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to human trafficking courts (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Relative to human trafficking courts (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 ADOPT (#1714) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 569 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1580) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 569 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#829) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#660) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 CO-AUTHORS (#659) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 569 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1580) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 569 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#829) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#660) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 CO-AUTHORS (#659) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 554. |
2014-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2014-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2014-05-28 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-14 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Broome, and Martiny. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2014-05-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Stokes, Arnold, and Abramson. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2014-05-12 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2014-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |