LA HB503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 10/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 10/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protects certain individuals from financial exploitation
Title
Protects certain individuals from financial exploitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 503 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1057) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 10/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |