LA HB437 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the development of the budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the development of the budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 437 ADOPT (#1055) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 437 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#953) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 437 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#843) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 437 FINAL PASSAGE (#934) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 437 FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 437 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#953) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 437 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#843) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 437 FINAL PASSAGE (#934) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 437 FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 419. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Donahue, and Alario. |
2013-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Harris, Fannin, and Berthelot. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-07 | House | Notice removed |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0-1) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |