LA HB407 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to support and service animals
Title
Provides relative to support and service animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 407 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Notice given. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |