LA HB1252 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Sharing distribution for Fiscal Year 2010-2011
Title
Revenue Sharing distribution for Fiscal Year 2010-2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1252, FINAL PASSAGE (#1883) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1252, FINAL PASSAGE (#1226) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1252, FINAL PASSAGE (#1226) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1037. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2010-06-07 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-06-07 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2010. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title. |