LA HB1150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to military honor license plates for service during the Cold War
Title
Provides relative to military honor license plates for service during the Cold War
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 1150 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1101) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1150 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1150 CO-AUTHORS (#924) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 1150 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1150 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1150 CO-AUTHORS (#924) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 1150 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434. |
2014-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-22 | House | Read third time by title,amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2014. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2014-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title. |