LA HB1086 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for general application of laws relative to medical consent and declarations concerning life-sustaining procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for general application of laws relative to medical consent and declarations concerning life-sustaining procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-28 - Senate Vote on HB 1086, FINAL PASSAGE (#1482) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House Vote on HB 1086, FINAL PASSAGE (#483) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-11 Effective date: August 1, 2012.
2012-06-11 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 715.
2012-05-30 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2012-05-29 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-29 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-29 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2012-05-28 Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-05-24 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-05-23 Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-04-24 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-04-23 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2012-04-23 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-04-12 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2012.
2012-04-12 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-04-11 Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
2012-04-04 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-04-03 Read by title.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback