LA HB101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the duties of the treasurer in certain circumstances (RE +$56,336 SG EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the duties of the treasurer in certain circumstances (RE +$56,336 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 101 FINAL PASSAGE (#441) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2013-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (5-2) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013. |
2013-03-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-12 | House | Prefiled. |