LA HB1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2013-2014
Title
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2013-2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#964) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 ADOPT (#1061) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#892) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3422 BY MORRISH SCHEDULE 19-HIGHER EDUCATION (#891) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3427 BY PETERSON SCHEDULE 12-DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE (#890) (Y: 7 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3423 BY CROWE LAY ON THE TABLE (#889) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3414 BY CROWE LAY ON THE TABLE (#888) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#354) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3015 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#353) (Y: 28 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 19-DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (#352) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3009 BY BARROW MOTION TO ADOPT (#351) (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2973 BY JOHNSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#350) (Y: 33 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2987 BY THOMPSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#349) (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2957 BY HARRISON MOTION TO ADOPT (#348) (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2869 BY LAMBERT MOTION TO ADOPT (#347) (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT NO. 11 (#177) (Y: 23 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 72 142 and 145 (#179) (Y: 21 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 RECONSIDER the Motion to Engross (#178) (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 ADOPT (#1061) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#892) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3422 BY MORRISH SCHEDULE 19-HIGHER EDUCATION (#891) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3427 BY PETERSON SCHEDULE 12-DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE (#890) (Y: 7 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3423 BY CROWE LAY ON THE TABLE (#889) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3414 BY CROWE LAY ON THE TABLE (#888) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#354) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3015 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#353) (Y: 28 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 19-DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (#352) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3009 BY BARROW MOTION TO ADOPT (#351) (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2973 BY JOHNSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#350) (Y: 33 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2987 BY THOMPSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#349) (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2957 BY HARRISON MOTION TO ADOPT (#348) (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2869 BY LAMBERT MOTION TO ADOPT (#347) (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT NO. 11 (#177) (Y: 23 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 72 142 and 145 (#179) (Y: 21 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 RECONSIDER the Motion to Engross (#178) (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 14. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Alario, Donahue, and Murray. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Fannin, Kleckley, Harris, Edwards, Katrina Jackson, and Henry. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/01. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title. Considered in Committee of the Whole, reported with amendments, amendments adopted. |
2013-05-10 | House | House floor amendments adopted. |
2013-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/10/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/9/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reconsidered. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (15-9) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2013. |
2013-03-05 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-05 | House | Prefiled. |