KY SB61 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.400, 210.366, 335.600, 335.605, 335.610, 335.615, 335.620, 335.625, 335.630, 335.635, 335.640, 335.650, 335.699, and 645.020, and KRE 506 to designate "licensed clinical" pastoral counselors rather than "certified fee-based" pastoral counselors; authorize a board member whose term has expired to serve until his or her successor is appointed and qualified; allow certificate holders certified before January 1, 2015, to transition to licensure; prohibit the use of "LCPC" or any similar abbreviation, or holding oneself out as having this status, by anyone except a licensed clinical pastoral counselor.
Title
AN ACT relating to the licensure of fee-based pastoral counselors.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 64-30 |
2014-03-26 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-18 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-02-14 | House | received in House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-15 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |