KY SB184 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 251.370 to specify financial statement requirements; amend KRS 251.440 to specify application requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to grain.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. David Givens [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Matt Castlen [R] |
Sen. Stan Humphries [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] | Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 366 (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1273 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1273 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 114) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-3 |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Agriculture (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Agriculture (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-09 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | received in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |