KY SB139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 292 to establish a registration exemption for private fund advisers; establish requirements for the exemption; direct where filings shall be made; require investment advisers to comply with registration requirements within 90 days of becoming ineligible for exemption; permit the commissioner of the Department of Financial Institutions to waive certain provisions; amend KRS 292.330 to conform; make technical amendments.
Title
AN ACT relating to investment advisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 394 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2915 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2915 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | received in House |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 16, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | introduced in Senate |