KY SB119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Abolish the Division of Administration and the Division of Business Filings in the Office of the Secretary of State; create the Office of Administration, Office of Business, and Office of Elections, and describe duties of the offices; confirm Secretary of State Executive Order 2012-01.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-05 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2013-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-26 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | received in House |
2013-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |