KY HCR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish a task force to study the Unified Juvenile Code; establish membership of task force; provide that the task force is to study issues related to status offenders, the use of community resources, alternatives to detention, reinvestment of savings to create community based treatment programs, feasibility of establishing an age of criminal responsibility, issues related to domestic violence and its impact on children exposed to domestic violence, issues related to special needs children, and use of validated risk and needs assessments; require the task force to submit a report to the Legislative Research Commission by November 1, 2012.
Title
Establish a task force to study the Unified Juvenile Code; establish membership of task force; provide that the task force is to study issues related to status offenders, the use of community resources, alternatives to detention, reinvestment of savings to create community based treatment programs, feasibility of establishing an age of criminal responsibility, issues related to domestic violence and its impact on children exposed to domestic violence, issues related to special needs children, and use of validated risk and needs assessments; require the task force to submit a report to the Legislative Research Commission by November 1, 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 37) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-28 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-27 | passed 98-0 | |
2012-03-27 | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (2) | |
2012-03-26 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2) | |
2012-03-22 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-03-22 | received in House | |
2012-03-21 | adopted 34-0 with floor amendment (2) | |
2012-03-21 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading | |
2012-03-21 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | floor amendment (2) filed | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-15 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-02-10 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-10 | 3rd reading, adopted 94-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-09 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2012 | |
2012-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-06 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-06 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HC129.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HC129/bill.doc |