KY HB635 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.350 to require an actuary performing an actuarial analysis to clearly note and describe a new assumption or method and the basis for selecting the assumption or method, including any documentation, studies, written opinions, calculations, or citations in support; require the actuary certify that the information provided in the analysis is accurate; amend KRS 6.948 to require the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to include in a fiscal impact statement any documentation, studies, written opinions, calculations, and citations in support of his or her findings and conclusions and include in the statement an estimate of any potential future cost savings, including an explanation why the bill would or would not provide future cost savings; require the commissioner to certify that the information provided in the fiscal impact statement is accurate; amend KRS 6.949 to require the commissioner of the Department of Corrections to include in a corrections impact statement any documentation, studies, written opinions, calculations, and citations in support of the department's findings and conclusions, an estimate of any potential future cost savings, if not already included in a statement, and certification by the commissioner that the information provided in the statement is accurate.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3176 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2024-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fiscal Note
General Assembly
Insurance, Health
Jails and Jailers
Police, City and County
Police, State
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Fiscal Note
General Assembly
Insurance, Health
Jails and Jailers
Police, City and County
Police, State
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies