KY HB462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 222.500 to define terms related to recovery residences; amend KRS 222.502 to permit a recovery residence that provides on-site clinical services or access to on-site clinical services to continue to operate without certification from a certifying organization until December 31, 2024; amend KRS 222.504 to authorize the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and local governments to impose civil fines on uncertified recovery residences; amend KRS 222.506 to establish the conditions under which a recovery residence may provide on-site clinical services or access to on-site clinical services.
Title
AN ACT relating to recovery residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3143 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 146 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 146 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-02-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-05 | House | introduced in House |