KY HB418 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 405.021 to allow siblings to petition for reasonable visitation rights.
Title
AN ACT relating to sibling visitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2014-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB418.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB418/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB418/vote_history.pdf |