KY HB40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.557 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to establish a statewide system of evaluation for all certified personnel; require the Department of Education, in partnership with professional organizations, to develop the system prior to the 2013-2014 school year; require the board to establish the weights to be applied to each performance criteria; delete three-phase alternative evaluation plan; allow waiver of evaluation plan under certain conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to educator evaluation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | to Education (S) | |
2012-01-23 | received in Senate | |
2012-01-20 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, January 20, 2012 | |
2012-01-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-05 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Education (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House | |
2012-10-05 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Education |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB40.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB40/bill.doc |