KY HB387 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.102 to require the Education Professional Standards Board to issue substitute teacher certificates based on education attained; specify the type of employment each certificate allows.
Title
AN ACT relating to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 476 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3186 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 106 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3186 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 106 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 94-0 |
2024-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-4 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | introduced in House |