KY HB271 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.030 to allow a person to make a written report of dependency, neglect, or abuse of a child.
Title
AN ACT relating to child abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicolas Wilson [R] | Rep. Samara Heavrin [R] | Rep. Beverly Chester-Burton [D] | Rep. Jennifer Henson Decker [R] |
Rep. Rachel Roarx [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3132 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 228 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 228 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-14 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-01-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-16 | House | introduced in House |