KY HB19 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 100)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 100)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.420, regarding the disposition of forfeited property, to clarify that any vehicle forfeited which is contaminated with methamphetamine shall not be used, resold, or salvaged for parts, but shall instead be destroyed or salvaged for scrap metal; clarify that determination of methamphetamine contamination is made by law enforcement agencies; clarify that the presence of prepackaged materials or other products or precursors not subject to extraction shall not qualify a vehicle as being contaminated.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disposal of vehicles forfeited to law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Collins [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 100) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-2 |
2015-02-11 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-12 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |