KY HB167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 416.660, relating to eminent domain, to allow separately deeded tracts of land owned by the same person to be considered as a single parcel for valuation purposes; amend KRS 416.580, 416.600, and 416.610 to conform; provide that the changes apply to condemnation proceedings initiated on or after the effective date of the Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 |
2014-02-28 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB167.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB167/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB167/vote_history.pdf |