KY HB11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 14A.3-010, 271B.1-400, 271B.2-020, 271B.6-260, 271B.7-400, 271B.8-300, 271B.13-020, and 271B.16-210, and create a new section of Subtitle 11 of KRS Chapter 271B to establish public benefit corporations.
Title
AN ACT relating to public benefit corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 68-29 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | recommitted to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | posting waived |
2015-01-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
2015-08-07 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB11.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB11/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB11/vote_history.pdf |