KS SB467 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 94 Nay: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 94 Nay: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the membership appointed by the governor on the council on travel and tourism and updating the house committee assignment required for house members from the committee on agriculture and natural resources to the committee on commerce, labor and economic development;reducing the required allocation of funds from the department of commerce's matching grant program for the promotion of tourism by public and nonprofit entities and removing the restriction on the percentage of such funds granted to a single entity.
Title
Increasing the membership appointed by the governor on the council on travel and tourism and updating the house committee assignment required for house members from the committee on agriculture and natural resources to the committee on commerce, labor and economic development;reducing the required allocation of funds from the department of commerce's matching grant program for the promotion of tourism by public and nonprofit entities and removing the restriction on the percentage of such funds granted to a single entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 94 Nay: 26 (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 94 Nay: 26 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Tarwater, Representative Borjon and Representative Probst appointed as conferees |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Erickson , Senator Dietrich and Senator Reddi as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 6 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2024-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2024-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |