KS SB462 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the director of vehicles to adopt rules and regulation for participation in the federal motor carrier safety administration's drug and alcohol clearinghouse program and authorizing the director of vehicles to waive the commercial driver's license knowledge and skills test for an applicant that provides evidence that such applicant qualifies for the military even exchange program.
Title
Authorizing the director of vehicles to adopt rules and regulation for participation in the federal motor carrier safety administration's drug and alcohol clearinghouse program and authorizing the director of vehicles to waive the commercial driver's license knowledge and skills test for an applicant that provides evidence that such applicant qualifies for the military even exchange program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Francis, Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard appointed as conferees |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Kloos and Senator Corson as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |