KS SB412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 5, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 5, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying criminal sentencing rules applicable in multiple conviction cases where consecutive sentences may be imposed by the sentencing judge and the sentence for the primary crime is a nonprison sentence.
Title
Modifying criminal sentencing rules applicable in multiple conviction cases where consecutive sentences may be imposed by the sentencing judge and the sentence for the primary crime is a nonprison sentence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 5, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |