KS SB349 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 349 by Committee on Judiciary - Continuing in existence certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.
Title
House Substitute for SB 349 by Committee on Judiciary - Continuing in existence certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 35 Nay: 0 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees |
2024-03-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 8 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2024-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-19 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 7, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |