KS SB3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment benefits for privately contracted school bus drivers.
Title
Unemployment benefits for privately contracted school bus drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 04, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 03, 2014 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb3/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb3_00_0000.pdf |