KS SB194 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community developmental disability organizations; performance of functional assessments.
Title
Community developmental disability organizations; performance of functional assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 1:30 AM Room 118-N |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb194/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb194_00_0000.pdf |