KS SB142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring drivers to proceed with due caution when passing stationary vehicles displaying hazard warning lights and prohibiting the use of mobile telephones by individuals under 18 years of age and for everyone in school and construction zones and providing penalties thereof for violations.
Title
Requiring drivers to proceed with due caution when passing stationary vehicles displaying hazard warning lights and prohibiting the use of mobile telephones by individuals under 18 years of age and for everyone in school and construction zones and providing penalties thereof for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 21 (Y: 98 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 102 Nay: 18 (Y: 102 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 104 Nay: 18 (Y: 104 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 18 Nay: 21 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 102 Nay: 18 (Y: 102 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 104 Nay: 18 (Y: 104 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 18 Nay: 21 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 21 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-03 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Francis, Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Kloos and Senator Corson appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 102 Nay: 18 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Francis, Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard appointed as conferees |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Kloos and Senator Corson as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 104 Nay: 18 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-19 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 18 Nay: 21 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |