KS HB2834 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring officers, employees, powers, duties and functions relating to the state health care benefits program from the division of the state employee health benefits plan of the department of administration to the insurance department, establishing the commissioner of insurance as the chairperson of the Kansas state employees health care commission, providing that all management functions of such commission be administered by the commissioner of insurance and eliminating a pilot program regarding employer contributions for certain children.
Title
Transferring officers, employees, powers, duties and functions relating to the state health care benefits program from the division of the state employee health benefits plan of the department of administration to the insurance department, establishing the commissioner of insurance as the chairperson of the Kansas state employees health care commission, providing that all management functions of such commission be administered by the commissioner of insurance and eliminating a pilot program regarding employer contributions for certain children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 81 Nay: 42 (Y: 81 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 42 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-03-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-12 | House | House Introduced |