KS HB2757 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the adoption savings account act, allowing individuals to establish adoption savings accounts with certain financial institutions, providing eligible expenses, requirements and restrictions for such accounts and establishing addition and subtraction modifications for contributions to such accounts under the Kansas income tax act.
Title
Enacting the adoption savings account act, allowing individuals to establish adoption savings accounts with certain financial institutions, providing eligible expenses, requirements and restrictions for such accounts and establishing addition and subtraction modifications for contributions to such accounts under the Kansas income tax act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |