KS HB2633 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and requiring water supply system and wastewater treatment facility operator certification examination fees to not exceed the costs for such exams.
Title
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and requiring water supply system and wastewater treatment facility operator certification examination fees to not exceed the costs for such exams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Water |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2024-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2024-01-30 | House | House Introduced |