KS HB2581 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the court's requirement to order child support be paid to the secretary when custody of a child is awarded to the secretary.
Title
Eliminating the court's requirement to order child support be paid to the secretary when custody of a child is awarded to the secretary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2024-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-01-24 | House | House Introduced |