KS HB2491 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the law enforcement training center fund; all liabilities of such fund are transferred to and imposed on the state general fund; moneys previously credited to such fund shall be credited to the state general fund.
Title
Abolishing the law enforcement training center fund; all liabilities of such fund are transferred to and imposed on the state general fund; moneys previously credited to such fund shall be credited to the state general fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-03-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 25, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2024-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | House Introduced |