KS HB2253 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 19 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 19 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion; prohibiting funding for abortion services; amending late-term abortion and woman's-right-to-know statutes.
Title
Abortion; prohibiting funding for abortion services; amending late-term abortion and woman's-right-to-know statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 90 Nay: 30 (Y: 90 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 28 Nay: 10 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 27 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 28 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 28 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 28 (Y: 9 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 31 (Y: 92 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wilson was rejected - Yea: 31 Nay: 90 (Y: 31 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 28 Nay: 10 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 27 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 28 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 28 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 28 (Y: 9 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 31 (Y: 92 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wilson was rejected - Yea: 31 Nay: 90 (Y: 31 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, 19 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 90 Nay: 30 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 10 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Siegfreid, Representative Brunk and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Senator Francisco replaces Senator Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Senator Francisco replaces Senator Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2013-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Siegfreid , Representative Brunk and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 11 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to withdraw from General Orders and be re-referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare. The motion failed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 27 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 28 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 28 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 28 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 28 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 22, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 118-N |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 92 Nay: 31 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, 19 March 2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bollier was rejected |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bollier |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bollier was rejected |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bollier |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bollier was rejected |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bollier |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wilson was rejected Yea: 31 Nay: 90 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wilson |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2013-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-02-06 | House | House Introduced |