KS HB2209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the psychology interjurisdictional compact to provide for interjurisdictional authorization to practice telepsychology and temporary in-person, face-to-face psychology.
Title
Enacting the psychology interjurisdictional compact to provide for interjurisdictional authorization to practice telepsychology and temporary in-person, face-to-face psychology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 3 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |