KS HB2201 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2201 by Committee on Transportation - Decreasing the Eisenhower legacy transportation program alternate delivery project threshold, authorizing the usage of federal stimulus funds and KDOT bonding authority.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2201 by Committee on Transportation - Decreasing the Eisenhower legacy transportation program alternate delivery project threshold, authorizing the usage of federal stimulus funds and KDOT bonding authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 95 Nay: 27 (Y: 95 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 95 Nay: 27 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2021-04-06 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | House Introduced |