KS HB2069 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2069 by Committee on Judiciary - Prohibiting conveyance of certain real property in this state to foreign adversaries.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2069 by Committee on Judiciary - Prohibiting conveyance of certain real property in this state to foreign adversaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 9, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |