KS HB2034 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a referral of an alleged victim of child abuse or neglect for an examination as part of an investigation, creating a program in the department of health and environment to provide training and payment for such examinations.
Title
Requiring a referral of an alleged victim of child abuse or neglect for an examination as part of an investigation, creating a program in the department of health and environment to provide training and payment for such examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate Calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Concannon |
2023-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2023-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-01-17 | House | House Introduced |