IN SB0538 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher collective bargaining. Adds a definition of "professional employee organization". Provides that a school employer shall submit a copy of the affidavit submitted by the exclusive representative indicating the number of teachers who are members of the exclusive representative to the board. Provides that if the Indiana education employment relations board (board) determines that the affidavit indicates that the exclusive representative does not represent a majority of the employees, the board shall investigate the affidavit. Provides that after investigation by the board, the board may, if necessary, hold a hearing concerning representation by the school employee organization, and, based on
Title
Teacher collective bargaining. Adds a definition of "professional employee organization". Provides that a school employer shall submit a copy of the affidavit submitted by the exclusive representative indicating the number of teachers who are members of the exclusive representative to the board. Provides that if the Indiana education employment relations board (board) determines that the affidavit indicates that the exclusive representative does not represent a majority of the employees, the board shall investigate the affidavit. Provides that after investigation by the board, the board may, if necessary, hold a hearing concerning representation by the school employee organization, and, based on
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Torr added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 30, nays 19 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |