IN SB0536 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Methamphetamine. Defines "drug related felony" and requires courts to report drug related felonies to the state police department. Requires the state police department to report drug related felonies to NPLEx so that NPLEx can generate a stop sale alert to prevent individuals with drug related felonies from purchasing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine. Provides that the offense of possession of a precursor by a methamphetamine offender (which prohibits the possession of pseudoephedrine or ephedrine without a prescription by persons convicted of certain offenses) applies to a person who has been convicted of a drug related felony.
Title
Methamphetamine. Defines "drug related felony" and requires courts to report drug related felonies to the state police department. Requires the state police department to report drug related felonies to NPLEx so that NPLEx can generate a stop sale alert to prevent individuals with drug related felonies from purchasing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine. Provides that the offense of possession of a precursor by a methamphetamine offender (which prohibits the possession of pseudoephedrine or ephedrine without a prescription by persons convicted of certain offenses) applies to a person who has been convicted of a drug related felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representatives Washburne and Lawson added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 267: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed; Roll Call 201: yeas 32, nays 17 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Head added as third author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young R Michael and Yoder |