IN SB0385 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Murder sentencing; aggravating circumstance. Permits the state to seek the death penalty or a sentence of life without parole for a murder committed in a building primarily used for educational purposes if the murder is committed: (1) on school property or in a building owned by a post-secondary educational institution; and (2) at a time when children are likely to be present (for a building on school property) or classes are in session (for a building owned by a post-secondary educational institution). Authorizes the state to seek the death penalty or a sentence of life without parole for a murder
Title
Murder sentencing; aggravating circumstance. Permits the state to seek the death penalty or a sentence of life without parole for a murder committed in a building primarily used for educational purposes if the murder is committed: (1) on school property or in a building owned by a post-secondary educational institution; and (2) at a time when children are likely to be present (for a building on school property) or classes are in session (for a building owned by a post-secondary educational institution). Authorizes the state to seek the death penalty or a sentence of life without parole for a murder
Sponsors
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Rep. Judson McMillin [R] |
Rep. Randy Truitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Truitt added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as third author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b) reassigned to committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |