IN SB0320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Steele added as second author
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Steele added as second author
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jurisdiction of the attorney general. Specifies actions in which a public officer or public servant is accused and for which the attorney general has concurrent jurisdiction with a prosecuting attorney.
Title
Jurisdiction of the attorney general. Specifies actions in which a public officer or public servant is accused and for which the attorney general has concurrent jurisdiction with a prosecuting attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smith J |